ND SCR4012 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to establish a state policy to support the reliability and resilience of the electric grid, ensure price transparency to consumers in electric markets, and incentivize carbon capture utilization and storage as an alternative to preserve dispatchable thermal electric generation and its associated benefits.
Title
A concurrent resolution to establish a state policy to support the reliability and resilience of the electric grid, ensure price transparency to consumers in electric markets, and incentivize carbon capture utilization and storage as an alternative to preserve dispatchable thermal electric generation and its associated benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |