ND SCR4012 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 19 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 19 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the homestead tax credit thresholds for individuals who are permanently and totally disabled.
Title
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the homestead tax credit thresholds for individuals who are permanently and totally disabled.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 19 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 19 nays 73 |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |