ND 4010 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution clarifying the 1975 ratification by the 44th Legislative Assembly of the proposed 1972 Equal Rights Amendment to the Constitution of the United States only was valid through March 22, 1979.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution clarifying the 1975 ratification by the 44th Legislative Assembly of the proposed 1972 Equal Rights Amendment to the Constitution of the United States only was valid through March 22, 1979.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 03/24
2021-03-24SenateSigned by President
2021-03-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-19SenateReturned to Senate
2021-03-19HouseSecond reading, adopted
2021-03-19HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0
2021-03-18HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-03-11HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-02-23HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading, adopted
2021-02-17SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0
2021-02-05SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback