ND 4009 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution recognizing the cooperative efforts of the rotary clubs and districts, and the citizens of multiple states from southern Texas to the far northern reaches of North Dakota and Saskatchewan, in the completion of marking the North Dakota segment of the Great Western Cattle Trail on June 27, 2021, and acknowledging the legendary role of the Great Western Cattle Trail in the history of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution recognizing the cooperative efforts of the rotary clubs and districts, and the citizens of multiple states from southern Texas to the far northern reaches of North Dakota and Saskatchewan, in the completion of marking the North Dakota segment of the Great Western Cattle Trail on June 27, 2021, and acknowledging the legendary role of the Great Western Cattle Trail in the history of the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 04/19
2021-04-19SenateSigned by President
2021-04-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-09SenateReturned to Senate
2021-04-09HouseSecond reading, adopted
2021-03-19HouseReported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 12 0 2
2021-03-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-02-10HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-09SenateSecond reading, adopted
2021-02-05SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-02-04SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback