ND 4009 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility and desirability of the water resource boards in each drainage basin forming a joint water resource board to plan and construct water conveyance projects based on basinwide needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility and desirability of the water resource boards in each drainage basin forming a joint water resource board to plan and construct water conveyance projects based on basinwide needs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 03/15
2019-03-15SenateSigned by President
2019-03-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-14SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-13HouseSecond reading, adopted
2019-03-11HouseReported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2019-02-11HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-08SenateSecond reading, adopted
2019-02-07SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-31SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback