ND 4008 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Filed with Secretary Of State 02/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution declaring February 11, 2021, as Giving Hearts Day in North Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution declaring February 11, 2021, as Giving Hearts Day in North Dakota.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 02/09
2021-02-09SenateSigned by President
2021-02-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-08SenateReturned to Senate
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading, adopted
2021-02-08HouseIntroduced, first reading
2021-02-05HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-05SenateSecond reading, adopted
2021-02-04SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-02-04SenateCommittee Hearing 11:15
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback