ND SCR4006 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Filed with Secretary Of State 02/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Filed with Secretary Of State 02/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to recognize Monday, February 25, 2019, as "Bank of North Dakota Day" and to congratulate the Bank of North Dakota on its 100th anniversary.
Title
A concurrent resolution to recognize Monday, February 25, 2019, as "Bank of North Dakota Day" and to congratulate the Bank of North Dakota on its 100th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 02/19 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |