ND 4005 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section 9 of article III and section 16 of article IV of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to voting on constitutional amendments at general elections and constitutional amendments proposed by the legislative assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting on constitutional amendments at general elections and constitutional amendments proposed by the legislative assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading, adopted yeas 39 nays 7
2021-02-18SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-01-28SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback