ND SCR4005 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 11 nays 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 11 nays 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section 26 of article X of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to use of the principal and earnings of the legacy fund to create the North Dakota first fund for the purpose of funding permanent infrastructure projects.
Title
Use of the principal and earnings of the legacy fund to create the North Dakota first fund for the purpose of funding permanent infrastructure projects.
Sponsors
Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 11 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 11 nays 34 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |