ND SCR4004 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to urge Congress to allow and support the use of thorium reactors in this state for the creation of energy and medical isotopes.
Title
A concurrent resolution to urge Congress to allow and support the use of thorium reactors in this state for the creation of energy and medical isotopes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 1 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba4004.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-3022-01000.pdf |