ND SCR4003 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Filed with Secretary Of State 06/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Filed with Secretary Of State 06/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Government Finance Committee) A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section
Title
The foundation aid stabilization fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading, adopted as amended (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading, adopted as amended (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - House Second reading, adopted as amended (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading, adopted as amended (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - House Second reading, adopted as amended (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 06/16 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-28 | House | Second reading, adopted as amended yeas 68 nays 21 |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Second reading, adopted yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Conference committee appointed Kretschmar Maragos P. Anderson |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Flakoll Rust Schneider |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-02 | House | Second reading, adopted as amended yeas 69 nays 22 |
2015-04-02 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 0 |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | House | Request return from committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Second reading, adopted yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |