ND SCR4001 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section 9 of article III of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to the process for approving constitutional amendments.
Title
The process for approving constitutional amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - House - House Second reading, adopted as amended (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - House - House Second reading, adopted as amended (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/17 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading, adopted yeas 31 nays 15 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-11 | House | Second reading, adopted as amended yeas 63 nays 30 |
2019-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 08:15 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, adopted yeas 31 nays 16 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |