ND HCR3059 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 32 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 32 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the legalization of medical marijuana for individuals with serious medical conditions.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the legalization of medical marijuana for individuals with serious medical conditions.
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Mooney [D] | Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] |
Rep. Mary Johnson [R] | Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] | Rep. Kylie Oversen [D] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] |
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 32 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 32 nays 61 |
2015-03-11 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on consent calendar 7 6 0 |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |