ND 3055 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 5 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the potential uses of legacy fund earnings, including the use of earnings to provide tax relief, provide for reinvestment of legacy fund earnings, fund research and technological advancements, promote economic growth and diversification, and promote workforce development and career and technical education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the potential uses of legacy fund earnings, including the use of earnings to provide tax relief, provide for reinvestment of legacy fund earnings, fund research and technological advancements, promote economic growth and diversification, and promote workforce development and career and technical education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted as amended (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateSecond reading, failed to adopt yeas 5 nays 42
2019-04-25SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-24SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede)
2019-04-24HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-24HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede)
2019-04-23HouseAppoint Rep. B. Koppelman to replace Rep. Grueneich on conference committee
2019-04-23HouseConference committee report rejected
2019-04-23HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2019-04-22SenateConference committee appointed Cook Unruh Dotzenrod
2019-04-22HouseConference committee appointed Headland Grueneich Eidson
2019-04-22HouseRefused to concur
2019-04-19HouseRefused to concur
2019-04-18HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-04-18SenateSecond reading, adopted as amended yeas 45 nays 1
2019-04-18SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-04-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-18SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-03-08SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2019-03-08SenateReceived from House
2019-03-07HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 69 nays 23
2019-03-06HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0
2019-03-05HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback