ND HCR3051 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility, desirability, and benefits of expanding the goods and services produced by Roughrider Industries into additional noncompetitive markets to provide inmates with the training and skills to successfully reintegrate inmates into society.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility, desirability, and benefits of expanding the goods and services produced by Roughrider Industries into additional noncompetitive markets to provide inmates with the training and skills to successfully reintegrate inmates into society.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Vetter [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28 |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-03-05 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 1 3 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |