ND HCR3049 | 2021 | 67th Legislative Assembly Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Filed with Secretary Of State 11/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Filed with Secretary Of State 11/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution recognizing parents as the chief stakeholders of the future and education of their children.
Title
A concurrent resolution recognizing parents as the chief stakeholders of the future and education of their children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-11 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-12 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 11/12 |
2021-11-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-11-12 | House | Returned to House |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Engrossment placed on calendar 15 1 0 |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-11-11 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-11-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-11-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 1 0 |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-11-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Joint Technical Corrections Committee |