ND HCR3046 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the administrative rules process, including a review of any relevant statutes regarding administrative rules to determine if any statutes are unclear or ambiguous, the degree to which agencies are complying with the process, which state agencies are specifically exempt from the process, and if those state agencies should remain exempt.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the administrative rules process, including a review of any relevant statutes regarding administrative rules to determine if any statutes are unclear or ambiguous, the degree to which agencies are complying with the process, which state agencies are specifically exempt from the process, and if those state agencies should remain exempt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/14 |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned to House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-03-12 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |