ND HCR3044 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the impact of the SARS-CoV-2 (COVID-19) pandemic, including an analysis of whether certain populations are more susceptible to contracting COVID-19 and an analysis of the state residents who have been hospitalized or died from COVID-19, including whether the individuals had a pre-existing health condition, a disability, access to health care, health insurance, and whether the individual belonged to a population susceptible to serious illness from COVID-19.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the impact of the SARS-CoV-2 (COVID-19) pandemic, including an analysis of whether certain populations are more susceptible to contracting COVID-19 and an analysis of the state residents who have been hospitalized or died from COVID-19, including whether the individuals had a pre-existing health condition, a disability, access to health care, health insurance, and whether the individual belonged to a population susceptible to serious illness from COVID-19.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-03-10 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba3044.html |
Text | https://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-3109-01000.pdf |