ND 3043 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 02/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution declaring February 14, 2019, as Giving Hearts Day in North Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution declaring February 14, 2019, as Giving Hearts Day in North Dakota.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 02/14
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseReturned to House
2019-02-13SenateSecond reading, adopted
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced, first reading
2019-02-11SenateReceived from House
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading, adopted
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced, first reading

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback