ND HCR3041 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to pass Savanna's Act.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to pass Savanna's Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01 |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |