ND 3040 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 18 nays 28
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution to create and enact a new section to article X of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to the vote required for a tax increase and the imposition of a new tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The vote required for a tax increase and the imposition of a new tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 55 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading, failed to adopt yeas 18 nays 28
2021-03-29SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0
2021-03-24SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-03-10SenateReceived from House
2021-03-09HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 55 nays 34
2021-03-09HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1
2021-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback