ND 3039 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying student internships and compensation for student interns.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying student internships and compensation for student interns.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseSecond reading, failed to adopt
2021-03-04HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1
2021-03-03HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback