ND HCR3039 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 20 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 20 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to prohibit the unconstitutional use of property taxes to fund North Dakota's constitutional obligations.
Title
A concurrent resolution to prohibit the unconstitutional use of property taxes to fund North Dakota's constitutional obligations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 20 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 20 nays 73 |
2019-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, without recommendation 7 7 0 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |