ND 3038 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 30 nays 60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging North Dakota courts to refrain from referencing the United States Supreme Court decision in Roe v. Wade, 410 U.S. 113 (1973), or its holding in any decision or order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging North Dakota courts to refrain from referencing the United States Supreme Court decision in Roe v. Wade, 410 U.S. 113 (1973), or its holding in any decision or order.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 30 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseSecond reading, failed to adopt yeas 30 nays 60
2019-02-08HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback