ND 3034 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging North Dakota to continue strengthening and expanding sister-state ties between the state of North Dakota and the people of the Republic of China (Taiwan); supporting the signing of a Free Trade Agreement and Bilateral Investment Agreement between the United States and Taiwan; and reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging North Dakota to continue strengthening and expanding sister-state ties between the state of North Dakota and the people of the Republic of China (Taiwan); supporting the signing of a Free Trade Agreement and Bilateral Investment Agreement between the United States and Taiwan; and reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 03/17
2017-03-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-16SenateSigned by President
2017-03-15HouseReturned to House
2017-03-14SenateSecond reading, adopted
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced, first reading
2017-03-13SenateReceived from House
2017-03-13HouseSecond reading, adopted
2017-03-13HouseIntroduced, first reading

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback