ND 3033 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 26 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution calling for a convention to amend the United States Constitution to impose term limits on members of Congress.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution calling for a convention to amend the United States Constitution to impose term limits on members of Congress.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 26 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseSecond reading, failed to adopt yeas 26 nays 65
2021-02-22HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0
2021-02-19HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-02-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback