ND HCR3033 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 28 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 28 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to create and enact a new section to article XI of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to authorization for not more than six state-regulated, privately owned casinos in the state; and to amend and reenact section 25 of article XI of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to exceptions to the prohibition on games of chance.
Title
Exceptions to the prohibition on games of chance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 28 nays 63 |
2017-03-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 4 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 2 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |