ND 3032 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 14 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying methods of workforce expansion, enhancement, enlistment, and retention through educational programs and supports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying methods of workforce expansion, enhancement, enlistment, and retention through educational programs and supports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-03HouseSecond reading, failed to adopt yeas 14 nays 76
2017-03-02HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
2017-03-01HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback