ND HCR3029 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to pass a federal prohibition on abortions performed 20 weeks postfertilization.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to pass a federal prohibition on abortions performed 20 weeks postfertilization.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Rep. Bert Anderson [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] |
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/19 |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-15 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 1 1 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-27 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 77 nays 11 |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |