ND 3029 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 23 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the degree of tax collections volatility to which this state may be vulnerable and the feasibility of creating mechanisms, including the possibility of expanding the programs offered by the Bank of North Dakota to the agriculture, energy, and manufacturing sectors, to mitigate potential volatility of tax collections and state budget impact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the degree of tax collections volatility to which this state may be vulnerable and the feasibility of creating mechanisms, including the possibility of expanding the programs offered by the Bank of North Dakota to the agriculture, energy, and manufacturing sectors, to mitigate potential volatility of tax collections and state budget impact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 23 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15HouseSecond reading, failed to adopt yeas 23 nays 69
2017-03-09HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback