ND HCR3028 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to include state and local 911 dispatchers as qualified public safety employees and therefore not subject to the early distribution tax under the Internal Revenue Code retirement provisions.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to include state and local 911 dispatchers as qualified public safety employees and therefore not subject to the early distribution tax under the Internal Revenue Code retirement provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/12 |
2021-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-17 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2021-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |