ND HCR3028 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 20 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 20 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying article XIV of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to transparency of funding sources, lobbyists, conflicts of interest, and the establishment of an ethics commission.
Title
Transparency of funding sources, lobbyists, conflicts of interest, and the establishment of an ethics commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Chet Pollert [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] |
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 20 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 20 nays 72 |
2019-02-27 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Ethics Committee |