ND 3028 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Refused delivery from House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility and desirability of joining the prosperity states compact, including a comprehensive review of other states that have adopted the compact and the benefits provided to those states by establishing prosperity districts under the compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility and desirability of joining the prosperity states compact, including a comprehensive review of other states that have adopted the compact and the benefits provided to those states by establishing prosperity districts under the compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 48 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRefused delivery from House
2017-03-15HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 48 nays 44
2017-03-09HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 6 1
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback