ND HCR3028 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the feasibility and desirability of the establishment of county or multi-county emergency response centers outside of urban centers that already maintain emergency response agencies with around-the-clock staffing.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the feasibility and desirability of the establishment of county or multi-county emergency response centers outside of urban centers that already maintain emergency response agencies with around-the-clock staffing.
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Mooney [D] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Tracy Boe [D] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] |
Rep. Marie Strinden [D] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. David O'Connell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10 |
2015-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned to House |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-25 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 12 0 2 |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |