ND 3027 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging President Joseph R. Biden, Jr. to continue oil development on federal land and on federal minerals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging President Joseph R. Biden, Jr. to continue oil development on federal land and on federal minerals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 03/12
2021-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-11SenateSigned by President
2021-03-10HouseReturned to House
2021-03-09SenateSecond reading, adopted
2021-03-08SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2021-02-16SenateReceived from House
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading, adopted
2021-02-05HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee Hearing 10:45
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback