ND HCR3027 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-12 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-12 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging the Congress of the United States to take back its legislative authority to pass legislation and the President of the United States to recognize the constitutional separation of powers between the legislative and executive branches of government and not to abuse the use of executive orders.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging the Congress of the United States to take back its legislative authority to pass legislation and the President of the United States to recognize the constitutional separation of powers between the legislative and executive branches of government and not to abuse the use of executive orders.
Sponsors
Rep. David Monson [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] |
Sen. David Hogue [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-22 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 69 nays 23 |
2013-02-19 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 3 2 |
2013-02-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba3027.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-3054-01000.pdf |