ND HCR3027 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging the United States Department of Agriculture's Natural Resources Conservation Service to continue the present cooperative agreement process at a $10,000 funding level; allow continuation of local decisionmaking by resource conservation and development councils, including implementation of community development projects, for as long as Congress funds the Resource Conservation and Development program; and to allow a resource conservation and development coordinator colocated with a North Dakota regional council to maintain that colocation.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging the United States Department of Agriculture's Natural Resources Conservation Service to continue the present cooperative agreement process at a $10,000 funding level; allow continuation of local decisionmaking by resource conservation and development councils, including implementation of community development projects, for as long as Congress funds the Resource Conservation and Development program; and to allow a resource conservation and development coordinator colocated with a North Dakota regional council to maintain that colocation.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Rep. Jerome Kelsh [D] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] |
Rep. James Schmidt [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Concurred | |
2011-04-01 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-03-31 | Second reading, adopted as amended | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-25 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0 | |
2011-03-18 | Reconsidered | |
2011-03-17 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 1 | |
2011-03-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Received from House | |
2011-02-18 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-02-14 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 12 0 2 | |
2011-02-10 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2011-01-28 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |