ND HCR3026 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the membership and state supervision of the state's occupational and professional licensing boards in order to retain antitrust law immunity.
Title
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the membership and state supervision of the state's occupational and professional licensing boards in order to retain antitrust law immunity.
Sponsors
Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] |
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22 |
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-03-03 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |