ND HCR3025 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging the federal government to refrain from enacting regulations that threaten the reliability and affordability of electric power in North Dakota and to increase support for research, development, and deployment for next generation carbon-based energy generation.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging the federal government to refrain from enacting regulations that threaten the reliability and affordability of electric power in North Dakota and to increase support for research, development, and deployment for next generation carbon-based energy generation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/12 |
2021-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-15 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |