ND HCR3024 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to amend federal law, policies, and regulations relating to food safety and labeling to allow for standards and criteria to differentiate food products derived from animal products from those derived from laboratory-produced, cell-cultured meat products.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to amend federal law, policies, and regulations relating to food safety and labeling to allow for standards and criteria to differentiate food products derived from animal products from those derived from laboratory-produced, cell-cultured meat products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/07 |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 0 2 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-08 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 11 0 3 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |