ND 3023 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging Congress to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution to prohibit changing the number of justices serving on the United States Supreme Court and that the amendment should state the Supreme Court of the United States shall be composed of nine justices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging Congress to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution to prohibit changing the number of justices serving on the United States Supreme Court and that the amendment should state the Supreme Court of the United States shall be composed of nine justices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 04/16
2021-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-08SenateSigned by President
2021-04-06HouseReturned to House
2021-04-06SenateSecond reading, adopted
2021-03-30SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0
2021-03-29SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-23SenateReceived from House
2021-02-22HouseSecond reading, adopted
2021-02-19HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-18HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2021-02-17HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback