ND HCR3023 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution honoring the service and devotion our fallen armed forces veterans have made to this great nation.
Title
A concurrent resolution honoring the service and devotion our fallen armed forces veterans have made to this great nation.
Sponsors
Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] | Rep. Jeff Hoverson [R] | Sen. Bob Paulson [R] |
Rep. Austen Schauer [R] | Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03 |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-27 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 88 nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |