ND HCR3023 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 02/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 02/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution declaring February 9, 2017, as "Giving Hearts Day".
Title
A concurrent resolution declaring February 9, 2017, as "Giving Hearts Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Al Carlson [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 02/13 |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-10 | House | Returned to House |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading |