ND HCR3021 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 27 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 27 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to study the feasibility and desirability of privatizing Minot State University and two additional institutions of higher education under the control of the State Board of Higher Education which are not research universities.
Title
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to study the feasibility and desirability of privatizing Minot State University and two additional institutions of higher education under the control of the State Board of Higher Education which are not research universities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 27 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 27 nays 63 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |