ND HCR3021 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging Congress and the President of the United States to fulfill the federal government's promises to North Dakota, allow the utilization of the Garrison Diversion Unit facilities, including the McClusky Canal and the Snake Creek pumping plant, as a water supply for eastern and central North Dakota, irrigation, and for all other authorized project purposes, not deauthorize or repurpose any part of the Garrison Diversion Unit, and to allow the continuation of the Garrison Diversion project canal system to aid the delivery of water to the Red River Valley.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging Congress and the President of the United States to fulfill the federal government's promises to North Dakota, allow the utilization of the Garrison Diversion Unit facilities, including the McClusky Canal and the Snake Creek pumping plant, as a water supply for eastern and central North Dakota, irrigation, and for all other authorized project purposes, not deauthorize or repurpose any part of the Garrison Diversion Unit, and to allow the continuation of the Garrison Diversion project canal system to aid the delivery of water to the Red River Valley.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07 |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 91 nays 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, adopted as amended |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-14 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |