ND HCR3019 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the fiscal and safety impacts of United States Fish and Wildlife Service easements in North Dakota on the Department of Transportation, Department of Agriculture, and counties.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the fiscal and safety impacts of United States Fish and Wildlife Service easements in North Dakota on the Department of Transportation, Department of Agriculture, and counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Rep. James Schmidt [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29 |
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-25 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-17 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |