ND HCR3016 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 20 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 20 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section 3 of article IX of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to the membership of the board of university and school lands.
Title
The membership of the board of university and school lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 20 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 20 nays 74 |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |