ND HCR3015 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying best practices to reduce offender recidivism, increase educational opportunities, prepare incarcerated offenders to rejoin their communities, establish and implement a community transitional housing program, including independent host homes, and encourage communities to reintegrate previously incarcerated individuals into society.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying best practices to reduce offender recidivism, increase educational opportunities, prepare incarcerated offenders to rejoin their communities, establish and implement a community transitional housing program, including independent host homes, and encourage communities to reintegrate previously incarcerated individuals into society.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28 |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-03-07 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 88 nays 4 |
2019-03-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Hearing 03:35 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |