ND 3015 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State

Summary

Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Freborg, Wardner A concurrent resolution urging Congress to reject the bill known as the Freedom of Choice Act, which would invalidate virtually every abortion-related regulation enacted by the people of North Dakota through their elected officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Freborg, Wardner A concurrent resolution urging Congress to reject the bill known as the Freedom of Choice Act, which would invalidate virtually every abortion-related regulation enacted by the people of North Dakota through their elected officials.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-20 Filed with Secretary of State
2009-04-20 Signed by Speaker
2009-04-09 Signed by President
2009-04-03 Returned to House
2009-04-03 Second reading, adopted
2009-04-02 Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 001
2009-03-17 Committee Hearing 11:00
2009-02-25 Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services
2009-02-17 Received from House
2009-02-16 Second reading, adopted
2009-02-12 Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 010 n 002
2009-02-11 Committee Hearing 09:45
2009-01-26 Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback