ND 3014 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying solutions to provider and end-user barriers to access to and utilization of telehealth services in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying solutions to provider and end-user barriers to access to and utilization of telehealth services in this state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 04/14
2021-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-06SenateSigned by President
2021-04-05HouseReturned to House
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading, adopted
2021-03-29SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-29SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-18SenateReceived from House
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading, adopted
2021-02-11HouseReported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1
2021-02-10HouseCommittee Hearing 02:45
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback